open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:16-cv-02456
    Party Name:Advocates for Individuals with Disabilities Foundation Incorporated v. BRE DDR BR QUEEN CREEK AZ LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?991371
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =