open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:16-cv-02599
    Party Name:Frisby et al v. Mammoth, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?992911
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =