open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:16-cv-03275
    Party Name:Figueroa v. Casa Grande, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference ]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Status]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:July 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue ]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1001104
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =