U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-bk-11790-
  • Case Name: JANET BINNEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Close Bankruptcy Case (MCW)]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Updated Address Notice (Undeliverable Mail)]
February, 2017
  • February 25, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • February 23, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • February 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
January, 2017
  • January 07, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [oExtending Time to Pay Filing Fee (Form)]
  • January 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Extend Time to Pay Filing Fee (Motion to)]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • November 15, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 08, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • November 01, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Updated Address Notice (Undeliverable Mail)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (335 fee)]
  • October 20, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • October 18, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
  • October 17, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Request for Notice]
  • October 16, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Initial Mailing List]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice to Pro Se Debtors Form]
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • October 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.