open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:16-cv-08299
    Party Name:Wyler et al v. Colorado City, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment ]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum ]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief (Non Appeal)]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:May 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1015381
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =