open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00119
    Party Name:Denby et al v. Casa Grande, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
    Date Published:April 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:April 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:February 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:January 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1018035
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =