open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00649
    Party Name:Allen v. Avondale, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case ]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report Order ]
    Date Published:June 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Unexecuted]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1024995
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =