open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-01326--DKD
    Party Name:Grandinetti v. Eloy Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1030501
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =