open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-02155
    Party Name:Hernandez v. Gilbert, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment under Rule 54(b) ]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Appeal Fees]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion Hearings ]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulated Facts re Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1042337
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =