open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-02173
    Party Name:Turner v. Gila Bend, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment ]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1042546
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =