open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-03169
    Party Name:Land v. El Mirage Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1053747
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =