open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-03200
    Party Name:Adame et al v. Surprise, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application ]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate Hearing ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief (Non Appeal)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request ]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Status]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:August 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Unexecuted]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:March 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:March 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition ]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Counts/Claims]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1053815
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =