open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-03883--DKD
    Party Name:Eddards v. Casa Grande Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement ]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1060483
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =