open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-04045
    Party Name:Humphreys et al v. Coolidge, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:December 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw ]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:December 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum ]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1062929
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =