open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:17-cv-08260
    Party Name:Kingman Airport Authority v. Kingman, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for New Trial ]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request ]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Trial]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1067864
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =