open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:17-cv-08272
    Party Name:Kingman, City of v. Kingman Airport Authority Incorporated
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for New Trial ]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Trial]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:January 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:December 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1070462
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =