open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-00540
    Party Name:Celaya v. Goodyear, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:May 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1081400
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =