open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-01271
    Party Name:Gastelum v. Pacific Heritage Inn of Chandler LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:May 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 25, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1094516
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =