open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-01969
    Party Name:Amato v. Casa Grande, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Magistrate Judge Trial]
    Date Published:September 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 22, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1106882
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =