open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:18-cv-08159--JZB
    Party Name:Rea et al v. Lake Havasu City, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum ]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1111563
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =