open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-02528
    Party Name:Chapline v. Glendale, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1116342
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =