open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-02603--CDB
    Party Name:Davis v. Goodyear Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement ]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lodged Proposed Document]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1117853
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =