open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-02795
    Party Name:Robles v. Tolleson, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement ]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time re Rule 12]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:October 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [More Definite Statement]
    Date Published:September 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:September 05, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1121170
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =