open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:18-cv-08234
    Party Name:Wolf v. Lake Havasu City Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Hearing ]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default ]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Aside Default]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received ]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Entry of Default ]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Service Packet)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:December 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:November 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement ]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1125108
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =