open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03125
    Party Name:Smith v. Goodyear, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case ]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:October 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 02, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1126763
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =