open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03228--JFM
    Party Name:Villegas v. Glendale Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement ]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1128179
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =