open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-03568
    Party Name:Budd v. Gilbert, Town of
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case ]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 29, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1132473
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =