open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-02371
    Party Name:Taylor #186111 v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Unexecuted]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Packet Forwarded to USMS (Pris E-Filing)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (Service Packet)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lodged Proposed Document]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1113727
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =