open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01142--JZB
    Party Name:Washington v. Phoenix Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter ]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1155538
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =