open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01188
    Party Name:Salazar v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Counts/Claims]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Party]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1155891
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =