open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01391
    Party Name:Coyoy v. Eloy, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1157700
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =