open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01440--JFM
    Party Name:Reyes #260920 v. City of Glendale Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1158271
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =