open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01491
    Party Name:Leon v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order Ext MID Response Deadline for 30 Days (Settlement)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1158592
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =