open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-bk-06033-
    Party Name:ERIC WILLIAM HESKETH
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Change of Address]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13 (Reinstatements/Amended)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED)]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Recommendation]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Reply]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Hearing (Notice of)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Tax Information]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Response]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Set Hearing (Motion to)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Financial Management Course Certificate (batch)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Objection to Confirmation]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Change of Address (Creditor)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oDismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Objection]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Correspondence]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Submitting]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756813
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =