open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-bk-04752-
    Party Name:STEPHANIE MARIE CARPENTER
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:June 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756806
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =