open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-04744-
    Party Name:MONA LISA SWARM
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Intent to Lodge Dismissal Order]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [o~Generic~ Order]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Recommendation Amended or Modified Plan (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Objection to Confirmation]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Objection to Exempt Property]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oExtend Time to File Schedules, Stmts, Declarations, Plan or MML (Form)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Extend Time to File Chapter 13 Plan (Motion to)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Pro Se Debtors Form]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 12 or 13) - VAN Form]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756798
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =