open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02550
    Party Name:Pearl One Media v. Charisma Brands LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim ]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim ]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170144
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =