open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02486
    Party Name:Perez v. Campos et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1169776
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =