open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-04783-
    Party Name:KEVIN JAMES WELTY and KELSIE LYNN WELTY
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Request to Set Claims Bar Date]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Appointment of Trustee]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oReopening Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Motion to Reopen Case (Reopen Fee Due)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Close Bankruptcy Case (BKM)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756837
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =