open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-bk-04776-
    Party Name:Noel Oler and Misty Oler
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Objection/Evaluation - Amended or Modified Plan (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Converted to Chapter 13 and Notice of Conversion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oConverting Case to Chapter 7, 12 or 13]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [No Objection (Notice of)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Convert Chapter 7 or 11 Case to Chapter 13 (Motion to)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756830
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =