open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00639-1
    Party Name:USA v. Hub-Pop
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment Issued/Judgment of Probation Issued]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement ]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentencing ]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Lodged Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Terminate Merged Defendant]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:[DOJ Conflict Memo]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Indictment Pending]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to Indict ]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170306
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =