open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-mj-09156-1
    Party Name:USA v. Reyes-Colon
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Judgment and Commitment Issued/Judgment of Probation Issued]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Plea Agreement ]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Plea and Sentence (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to Indict ]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170239
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =