open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02485--DMF
    Party Name:Ovono Eyuima v. Keeton
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause ]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received ]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170193
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =