open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01440--JFM
    Party Name:Reyes v. City of Glendale Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1158271
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =