open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02896--ESW
    Party Name:Ware v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reopening Case ]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend ]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Amend]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1174529
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =