open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02865--DMF
    Party Name:Nunez v. Casa Grande, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1174963
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =