open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-03074
    Party Name:Fiori v. Peoria Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1176368
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =