open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-03095
    Party Name:Estrada v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Status]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1176458
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =