open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-03182
    Party Name:Madsen v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Bond ]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine ]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bond]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike ]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Bifurcate ]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joinder]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Other]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request ]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Crossclaim ]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim ]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reset Cal Conflict - Hearing ]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim ]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim ]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1177036
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =