open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-03833
    Party Name:Curiel v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1180339
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =